U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cv-05007
  • Case Name: Hillenbrand et al v. Blue Select Plan
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Reply]
  • January 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2017: [Leave to]
  • January 13, 2017: [Reply]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 15, 2016: [Response]
  • December 15, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 22, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 30, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • September 30, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 30, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 06, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 26, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 24, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • August 04, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 03, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 02, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 02, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 01, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2016: [Received]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 01, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
May, 2016
  • May 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 06, 2016: [Briefing Schedule]
  • May 05, 2016: [Form 52 Report]
  • May 05, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order for Form 52]
  • March 30, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Notice]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 24, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 24, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 10, 2016: [Return of Service Executed]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order of Recusal]
  • February 02, 2016: [Summons Reissued]
  • February 02, 2016: [Redacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.