U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:05-cr-50101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 15, 2021: [Response]
  • March 08, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • March 01, 2021: [Supplement]
  • March 01, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • February 16, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • February 12, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • February 01, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 11, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Letter]
  • August 06, 2020: [Response]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • July 24, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 11, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 11, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 08, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 30, 2018: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • April 30, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 24, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 24, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 20, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2018: [Letter]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 01, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 21, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 21, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 25, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 25, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • May 24, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
  • February 02, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.