U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-30148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 21, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 17, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 17, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 02, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 26, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 26, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 04, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 04, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 04, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 04, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 03, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 03, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.