U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:00-cr-40069-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Goltz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Response]
  • August 26, 2020: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 21, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • August 20, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.