U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cv-05012
  • Case Name: Penaloza-Trejo v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Response]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Brief]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2018: [Supplement]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Supplement]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Stay]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Declaration]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • July 20, 2016: [Stay]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • June 07, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • June 01, 2016: [Reply]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Order]
  • April 08, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Motion to Reduce Sentence - Johnson Claim (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.