U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frazier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 13, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 07, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 12, 2019: [Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 21, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 15, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 15, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 15, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 13, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 26, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 25, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 18, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 22, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 09, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 09, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 04, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 04, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 07, 2016: [Discovery]
  • March 07, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 02, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 01, 2016: [Continue]
  • March 01, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Response]
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 18, 2016: [Request]
  • February 10, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 09, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 09, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 09, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2016: [Indictment]
  • February 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 09, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 09, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 08, 2016: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 08, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.