U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Franch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 21, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 21, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 13, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 12, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Allocution Statement]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 08, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 07, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 06, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 29, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 29, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 27, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 27, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 24, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 24, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 24, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 24, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 22, 2016: [Discovery]
  • February 16, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • February 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 12, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 11, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 10, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 10, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 09, 2016: [Indictment]
  • February 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.