U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Adkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • February 17, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 28, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 28, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 28, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 28, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 28, 2016: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • December 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • December 27, 2016: [Continue]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 19, 2016: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 29, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 17, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 17, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • September 12, 2016: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • September 08, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 08, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 06, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 30, 2016: [Request]
  • March 24, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 23, 2016: [Request]
  • March 08, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 03, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 03, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 09, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.