U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Archambault
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 01, 2021: [Response to Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 29, 2021: [Extend]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 24, 2021: [Extend]
  • May 24, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 22, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 13, 2021: [Transcript]
  • May 12, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 10, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 05, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 26, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 26, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 26, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 26, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 05, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 05, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • July 15, 2019: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • July 15, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • July 09, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 08, 2019: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order on Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • December 07, 2017: [Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order]
  • November 14, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • October 27, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Judgment - Amended]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 22, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 21, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • March 21, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 17, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • March 15, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • March 15, 2016: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 24, 2016: [Discovery]
  • February 19, 2016: [Response]
  • February 19, 2016: [Request]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 17, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 16, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 11, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 09, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2016: [Indictment]
  • February 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.