U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez Mazariegos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 12, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 11, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 11, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • March 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 18, 2016: [Waiver]
  • February 11, 2016: [Response]
  • February 10, 2016: [Request]
  • February 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 09, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 09, 2016: [Indictment]
  • February 09, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.