U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flammond
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 23, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 23, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • May 23, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 16, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 16, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2016
  • April 23, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 10, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 10, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Waiver]
  • February 09, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [Indictment]
  • February 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.