U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:06-cr-40096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2016
  • March 03, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 23, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 11, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 11, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 11, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 10, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 10, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 10, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 10, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 10, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 10, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 10, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 10, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.