U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:05-cr-50089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shott
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 07, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 05, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 04, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 01, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 01, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 01, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • September 17, 2018: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • September 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 10, 2018: [Consent]
  • September 10, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 10, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 24, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 18, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 18, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 29, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 29, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 16, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 12, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 08, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 18, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 17, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 17, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 17, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 17, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 01, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 23, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 23, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 23, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 04, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 02, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 17, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 16, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 16, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 12, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 10, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 10, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 10, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 10, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 10, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 10, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 09, 2016: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • February 09, 2016: [Petition to Revoke Supervised Release (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 09, 2016: [Request for Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.