U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Cloud
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 28, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 24, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 04, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 31, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 31, 2020: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • July 29, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 29, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 29, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 27, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 21, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 21, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 20, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 23, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 16, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 19, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 03, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 03, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
  • December 03, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 19, 2018: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • November 19, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • November 19, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 14, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 02, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 02, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 02, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 01, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 22, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 14, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 26, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 26, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 28, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 27, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 27, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 23, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2017: [Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 16, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 16, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 16, 2016: [Consent]
  • December 16, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 09, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 05, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 30, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 30, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 30, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • July 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 15, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 09, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 09, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 09, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 21, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 16, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 16, 2016: [Request]
  • February 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 12, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 12, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 12, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 12, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 11, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 11, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 10, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 10, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.