U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
  • April 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 23, 2016: [Discovery]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • March 23, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • March 23, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2016: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 22, 2016: [Discovery]
  • February 19, 2016: [Response]
  • February 19, 2016: [Request]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order for Repayment of CJA Fees]
  • February 18, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 17, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 17, 2016: [Request]
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 17, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 17, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 17, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 17, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 17, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 17, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order for Repayment of CJA Fees]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 16, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 16, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 16, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 16, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.