U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cr-50013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hendren
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 27, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 27, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 16, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 16, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 24, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 24, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 06, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 06, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • November 10, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 10, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 14, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • September 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • August 25, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 25, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 22, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order]
  • June 27, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 31, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 15, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 14, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 13, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 11, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 28, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • March 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 15, 2016: [Consent]
  • March 15, 2016: [Request]
  • March 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2016: [Bond Posted]
  • March 11, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 11, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 11, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 11, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 11, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • March 09, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 02, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order of Recusal]
  • February 17, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.