U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:05-cr-50114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mousseau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 27, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 17, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 20, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 20, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 20, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 19, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 17, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 17, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.