U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 13, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 13, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • September 23, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 30, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 05, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 01, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 18, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • February 17, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 17, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 16, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 30, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 29, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 26, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 26, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 22, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 15, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 20, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 27, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 07, 2016: [Discovery]
March, 2016
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Response]
  • February 26, 2016: [Request]
  • February 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 25, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 25, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 25, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 23, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 17, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.