U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Traversie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Earned Pro-Social Time Off of Supervision]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 07, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • February 22, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 22, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 22, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 21, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 09, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 09, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 03, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 03, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 03, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 03, 2016: [Extend]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 28, 2016: [Extend]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 03, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 03, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 17, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 06, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 11, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 11, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 23, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 23, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • February 22, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 19, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 19, 2016: [Request]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 18, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2016: [Indictment]
  • February 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.