U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-30032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quick Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 31, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 19, 2016: [Continue]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 19, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 19, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 19, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 19, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 16, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 04, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • April 04, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 04, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 29, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 24, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 23, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 03, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 03, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 03, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 03, 2016: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 03, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • March 03, 2016: [Witness List]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 01, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 29, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 29, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 29, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.