U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Belt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 22, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 22, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 22, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • April 22, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • April 22, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 20, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 17, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 17, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 15, 2016: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • June 14, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 02, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 02, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 16, 2016: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 06, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 23, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 23, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 23, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 23, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 19, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 19, 2016: [Request]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 18, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 18, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.