U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goodshield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • November 12, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 07, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 26, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 26, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 06, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 06, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2016: [Departure]
  • June 01, 2016: [Variance]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 27, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 19, 2016: [Extend]
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 25, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order]
  • March 16, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 16, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 15, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • March 10, 2016: [Request]
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 09, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 09, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 08, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 08, 2016: [Request]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 08, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 18, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 18, 2016: [Indictment]
  • February 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.