U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blue Coat
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 10, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 04, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 12, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 12, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 30, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 30, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 30, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 29, 2018: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • November 29, 2018: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 29, 2018: [Request for Warrant]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 03, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 03, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 04, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 18, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 18, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 18, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 13, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 13, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 06, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • April 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 18, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 15, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • April 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 11, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 11, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 22, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 22, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 22, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 19, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 19, 2016: [Request]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 18, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 18, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.