U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • April 02, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 08, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 25, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 19, 2016: [Extend]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 21, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 19, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • September 19, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 19, 2016: [Arrest]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 24, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 23, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 23, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 31, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 31, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 04, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 29, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 29, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order]
  • February 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 18, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.