U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poorman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 12, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 08, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 08, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2016: [Variance]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 26, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 26, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 09, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 09, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 09, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 09, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • April 12, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2016: [Request]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • March 10, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 10, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 10, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 02, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 29, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 29, 2016: [Request]
  • February 29, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 29, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 29, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 29, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 29, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 18, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.