U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ducheneaux et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 17, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
  • August 17, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • August 17, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 15, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 12, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 08, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 23, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 18, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 16, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 30, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 30, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • March 30, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 28, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 22, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • October 15, 2021: [Release from Custody]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • September 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 10, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 10, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 11, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • August 11, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 11, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 11, 2021: [Furlough]
  • August 11, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 19, 2021: [Arraignment]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • May 06, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 06, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 16, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 12, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 08, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 07, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 21, 2020: [Furlough]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 20, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 12, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • August 12, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 12, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 21, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 16, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 16, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 16, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 16, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 03, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 03, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 02, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 01, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 19, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 19, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 13, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 06, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 24, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 15, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 15, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 01, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 01, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 18, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 13, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 12, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 12, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 06, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 29, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 29, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 18, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 18, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 21, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 20, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • December 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 20, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • December 19, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 16, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 16, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2016: [Departure]
  • December 14, 2016: [Brief]
  • December 14, 2016: [Variance]
  • December 14, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 13, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 12, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 12, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 12, 2016: [Departure]
  • December 12, 2016: [Variance]
  • December 07, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 21, 2016: [Consent]
  • November 21, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 21, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 17, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 14, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 20, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • September 26, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 20, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 20, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 19, 2016: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • September 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 01, 2016: [Furlough]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • August 29, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 26, 2016: [Departure]
  • August 24, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • August 15, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 22, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 11, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 11, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2016: [Consent]
  • June 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 12, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 12, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 12, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 03, 2016: [Furlough]
  • May 03, 2016: [Continue]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 19, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order]
  • April 14, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • April 14, 2016: [Enter Plea]
  • April 13, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 12, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 08, 2016: [Request]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 08, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 07, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 07, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 07, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 07, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 07, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 07, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2016: [Furlough]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2016: [Revoke]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 31, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 25, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • February 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 23, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 22, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 22, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2016: [Request]
  • February 19, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 19, 2016: [Request]
  • February 19, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 19, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 18, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.