U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • September 04, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 08, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 08, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 08, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • November 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 03, 2016: [Downward Departure]
  • November 03, 2016: [Variance]
  • November 01, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 24, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 05, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 22, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 16, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 16, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 01, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • June 13, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 13, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 10, 2016: [Release from Custody]
May, 2016
  • May 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 03, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 02, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Order]
  • April 11, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 07, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 06, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 06, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 05, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 05, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 05, 2016: [Request]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 05, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 05, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 04, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 18, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.