U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arellano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 05, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 04, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 27, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 20, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 12, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 23, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 23, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 16, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 02, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 02, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 25, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 24, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 21, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 19, 2016: [Variance]
  • October 14, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 14, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 12, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 25, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 25, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 25, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 21, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • April 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 24, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 23, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 23, 2016: [Request]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 23, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 19, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 19, 2016: [Request]
  • February 18, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 18, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 18, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.