U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hagen et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 01, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 25, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 01, 2019: [Transcript]
  • August 01, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 12, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 12, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 02, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 02, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 02, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 11, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Receipt]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order]
  • April 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • March 04, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 04, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 29, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 24, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • October 12, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 10, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 10, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 10, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 10, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 10, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 10, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • October 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • November 15, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • November 15, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • November 15, 2017: [Transcript]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 13, 2017: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 31, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 31, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • October 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 26, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • October 20, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 18, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 18, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 17, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 17, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 16, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 22, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 22, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 15, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2017: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 01, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 29, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 29, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • June 29, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • June 29, 2017: [Verdict]
  • June 29, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 28, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 28, 2017: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • June 28, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 27, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • June 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 21, 2017: [Witness List]
  • June 21, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 21, 2017: [Voir Dire Began]
  • June 21, 2017: [Jury List]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice]
  • June 19, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 19, 2017: [Witness List]
  • June 19, 2017: [Notice]
  • June 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 12, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 12, 2017: [In Limine]
  • June 12, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 12, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 12, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 12, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 21, 2017: [In Limine]
  • April 21, 2017: [Notice]
  • April 18, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 13, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 30, 2017: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 22, 2016: [Consent]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 18, 2016: [Consent]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 02, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 18, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 15, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Consent]
  • March 10, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order]
  • March 01, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Response]
  • February 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 25, 2016: [Request]
  • February 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2016: [Response]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 19, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 19, 2016: [Request]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 19, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 19, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 19, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 19, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 18, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 18, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 18, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.