U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Max et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • May 01, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 21, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 17, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 04, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • August 02, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 02, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 01, 2017: [Sentencing]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 27, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 27, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 19, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 07, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • July 06, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 29, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 20, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • May 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 18, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 18, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • May 11, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • May 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 05, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 05, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 04, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Waiver]
  • April 28, 2017: [Extend]
  • April 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 07, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 07, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 07, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 07, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Extend]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order]
  • March 31, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 31, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 30, 2017: [Extend]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 06, 2017: [Consent]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 29, 2016: [Consent]
  • December 29, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 07, 2016: [Consent]
  • October 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 05, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 05, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order]
  • April 26, 2016: [Response]
  • April 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 19, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 15, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 15, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 15, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 14, 2016: [Consent]
  • April 14, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 14, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2016: [Extend]
  • April 13, 2016: [Request]
  • April 13, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2016: [Consent]
  • April 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Order]
  • March 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • March 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 19, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 19, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • February 19, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 19, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 19, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 18, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 18, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 18, 2016: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.