U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-30048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sporrer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 26, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 20, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 30, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 08, 2016: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 08, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 08, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 25, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.