U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cr-50118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mills
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 24, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 06, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 04, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 04, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 04, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 04, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 03, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 02, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 06, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 06, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 06, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 26, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 26, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 18, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 21, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 20, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 19, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.