U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-30071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burning Breast
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [USCA Order]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
  • June 21, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • June 21, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 16, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 16, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 16, 2016: [Court Reporter Information]
  • June 16, 2016: [Declaration]
  • June 16, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 22, 2016: [Compel ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.