U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eagleshield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • December 26, 2018: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 13, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 13, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • December 12, 2016: [Sentencing]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 04, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 20, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 20, 2016: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 07, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 05, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 05, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 05, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 26, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 18, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 08, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 15, 2016: [Suppress]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 25, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 25, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.