U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chambers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 12, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 12, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 07, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 24, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 08, 2021: [Furlough]
  • March 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 03, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 03, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 03, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 06, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • November 06, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 06, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 06, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 05, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 02, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 04, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 04, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 24, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 22, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 14, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • March 18, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 18, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 18, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 18, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 18, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 18, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 18, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 18, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 17, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Judgment - Amended]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 26, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 26, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 12, 2016: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • September 12, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 01, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 24, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • August 12, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 23, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 23, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 22, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • June 16, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 14, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 14, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 29, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 29, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 26, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 25, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 24, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 24, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 24, 2016: [Request]
  • February 24, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 23, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.