U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Highbull
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 19, 2020: [Extend]
  • October 16, 2020: [Response]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 15, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 09, 2020: [Extend]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Supplement]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • September 22, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • September 22, 2020: [Admission]
  • September 21, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 17, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 11, 2019: [USCA Order]
July, 2018
  • July 06, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 06, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 29, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 29, 2017: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 28, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • August 16, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • August 16, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • August 09, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 04, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 04, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2017: [Declaration of Publication]
  • July 17, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 03, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 31, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • April 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 20, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 28, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 13, 2017: [Supplement]
  • March 13, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 08, 2017: [Transcript]
  • March 02, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • March 02, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 24, 2017: [Receipt]
  • February 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 21, 2017: [Suppress]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • December 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 18, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 29, 2016: [Request]
  • February 26, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 25, 2016: [Consent]
  • February 25, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 24, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 24, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 24, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 24, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment]
  • February 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 23, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 23, 2016: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.