U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roach
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 08, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 02, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 01, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Order of Detention]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 30, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 26, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 23, 2018: [Forfeiture]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 07, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 04, 2018: [Sentencing]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 18, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 18, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • March 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 26, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 25, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 19, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 19, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 14, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 14, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 14, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 01, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 26, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice]
  • May 19, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 17, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 17, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 10, 2017: [Furlough]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 05, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 04, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 04, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 04, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 04, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 04, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 04, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • January 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.