U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swallow et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 16, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 11, 2020: [Response]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 10, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Supplement]
  • August 21, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • August 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 19, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • August 17, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • June 14, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • February 16, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • February 16, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • February 14, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 02, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 31, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 25, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
  • January 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 12, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 06, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 19, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 16, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 16, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 15, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 15, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 29, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • October 06, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 05, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 16, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 16, 2016: [Consent]
  • September 16, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 26, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 26, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 26, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 26, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 26, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 25, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • August 25, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • August 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 25, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 11, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 11, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 11, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 10, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 10, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 10, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • July 15, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 15, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 15, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 11, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 21, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • June 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 10, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 08, 2016: [Sever Defendant]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 11, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order]
  • May 11, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 11, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • May 02, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2016: [Competency Report]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Text Order]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • February 29, 2016: [Request]
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 26, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 26, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 26, 2016: [Competency Evaluation]
  • February 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 25, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 25, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 25, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.