U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bad Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • February 26, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 19, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • February 19, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 09, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 06, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 06, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 24, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 23, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 19, 2019: [Request]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 19, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 17, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 15, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.