U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White Butterfly
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 19, 2023: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 19, 2023: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2023: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 16, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 12, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 12, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 03, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2021: [Consent]
  • March 24, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 24, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 24, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 21, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 18, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • November 18, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 04, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 24, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 20, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 20, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 20, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • October 19, 2016: [Departure]
  • October 17, 2016: [Extend]
  • October 17, 2016: [Variance]
  • October 14, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 14, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 15, 2016: [Extend]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 02, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 15, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 15, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 15, 2016: [Waiver]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 24, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 24, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 24, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 12, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 09, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 01, 2016: [Request]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 26, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 25, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 25, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.