U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ucha et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • May 02, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 25, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 25, 2019: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 18, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2018
  • May 28, 2018: [Forfeiture]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [Order]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • February 14, 2017: [Declaration of Publication]
  • February 13, 2017: [Forfeiture]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • November 22, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 22, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
  • November 21, 2016: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 15, 2016: [Transcript]
  • November 15, 2016: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • November 14, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 09, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 07, 2016: [Forfeiture]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 02, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 02, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • October 24, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 21, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 21, 2016: [Transcript]
  • October 17, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 17, 2016: [Court Reporter Information]
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 12, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 12, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 05, 2016: [Sentencing]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 27, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 26, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 17, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 10, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 29, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 27, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 27, 2016: [Consent]
  • June 27, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 10, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 10, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 10, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 09, 2016: [Consent]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2016: [Continue]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 27, 2016: [Consent]
  • May 27, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 13, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 13, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 13, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 22, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 16, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 09, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 26, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 26, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 26, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • February 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 26, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 25, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 25, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.