U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weibel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 16, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 13, 2020: [Response]
  • June 12, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 03, 2020: [Supplement]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 28, 2020: [Extend]
  • May 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • May 19, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • May 14, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Transcript - Redacted]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Transcript Redaction Request]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 26, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 26, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 16, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • August 18, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 18, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 21, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • June 14, 2017: [Evaluation]
  • June 14, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 14, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 14, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 25, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • April 21, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 03, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • March 03, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 03, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 03, 2017: [Consent]
  • March 03, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 03, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 03, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • March 02, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 23, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 23, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 23, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 02, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 18, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 07, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 07, 2016: [Reconsideration]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 30, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 30, 2016: [Furlough]
  • March 23, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 21, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 21, 2016: [Furlough]
  • March 11, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 24, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 24, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 24, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment]
  • February 24, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 24, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.