U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Old Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 20, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 04, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order]
  • April 11, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2016: [Furlough]
  • April 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 01, 2016: [Request]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 26, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 25, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 25, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.