U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Feather
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 14, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 25, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 25, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Transcript]
  • December 08, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 04, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 04, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 22, 2017: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • November 21, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 21, 2017: [Compel ]
  • November 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 25, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 25, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 05, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 05, 2016: [Transcript]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 05, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 04, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • May 02, 2016: [Response]
  • May 02, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • May 02, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 02, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Extend]
  • April 28, 2016: [Response]
  • April 27, 2016: [In Limine]
  • April 26, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • April 26, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • April 26, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • April 26, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 25, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • April 25, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 22, 2016: [Extend]
  • April 22, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 22, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 22, 2016: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice]
  • April 22, 2016: [In Limine]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 03, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 02, 2016: [Request]
  • March 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 01, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 01, 2016: [Consent]
  • March 01, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 01, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 01, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 29, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.