U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:08-cr-40167-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Majercik
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 15, 2025: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • April 15, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 15, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 26, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 25, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 24, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 29, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • February 25, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • February 25, 2016: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • February 24, 2016: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.