U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arteaga
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Judgment - Amended]
  • March 25, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 25, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 24, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 24, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 24, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • March 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2016: [Hearing ]
  • March 21, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 21, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 21, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 21, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 16, 2016: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 15, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 15, 2016: [Furlough]
  • March 02, 2016: [Consent]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order]
  • February 26, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 26, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 26, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 25, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 25, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 25, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 25, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 25, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 25, 2016: [Request]
  • February 25, 2016: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.