U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Orozco
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 11, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 11, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 10, 2017: [Seal Existing Document]
  • October 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 27, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 27, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Consent]
  • July 17, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 03, 2017: [Consent]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 08, 2016: [Consent]
  • November 03, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 03, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 20, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 26, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 26, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 26, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 26, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 04, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 12, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 12, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 12, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 21, 2016: [Consent]
  • April 21, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 14, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 11, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 11, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 08, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 01, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 26, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.