U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cordova
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • February 16, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 21, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 15, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 15, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • May 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 08, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 08, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 05, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 05, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 05, 2018: [Waiver]
  • January 05, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 04, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 04, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • January 04, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 04, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 17, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 13, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice]
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 26, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • May 26, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 26, 2016: [Text Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 05, 2016: [Transcript]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 22, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 20, 2016: [Response]
  • April 13, 2016: [Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 05, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • April 05, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • April 05, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 05, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 04, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • April 04, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 04, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 11, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 10, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 26, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 26, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.