U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-30015-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Morrison et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 13, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 08, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 29, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 29, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 29, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 29, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 23, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 08, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 02, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 30, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 30, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 29, 2016: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 01, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 01, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Order]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 08, 2016: [Release from Custody]
  • June 08, 2016: [Continue]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 18, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 09, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 20, 2016: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 06, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 06, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 06, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 06, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 05, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 30, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 30, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 29, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.