U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-30129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arcoren
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Order Dismissing Petition to Revoke]
  • December 15, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 15, 2017: [Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • December 15, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 11, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 07, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 24, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 23, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 19, 2016: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 19, 2016: [Furlough]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order]
  • April 14, 2016: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • April 08, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 01, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Furlough]
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 22, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 09, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 01, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 01, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 29, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 29, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 29, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 29, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.